MD HB1280 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence within the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to act as the statewide information repository for behavioral health treatment and diversion programs related to the criminal justice system; requiring the Center to monitor its models, plans, policies, strategies, programs, technical assistance, and training for opportunities to reduce the disparities in the criminalization of racial minorities with certain disorders; etc.
Title
Health - Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69 |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {473727/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB857 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Emergency Services
Examinations
Federal Aid
General Assembly
Grants
Health
Higher Education
Housing
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Public Health
Public Officials
Public Safety
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Rural Areas
Social Services
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse
Transportation
Veterans
Contracts
Counties
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Emergency Services
Examinations
Federal Aid
General Assembly
Grants
Health
Higher Education
Housing
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Public Health
Public Officials
Public Safety
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Rural Areas
Social Services
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse
Transportation
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 4201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |