MD SB856 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified health care providers to obtain consent for HIV testing in accordance with specified provisions of law and to test pregnant patients, except under specified circumstances, during the first and third trimesters of pregnancy; repealing specified provisions of law made obsolete by the Act; and providing that specified health care providers may not be subject to specified disciplinary action under specified circumstances.
Title
Public Health - HIV Testing During Pregnancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {356987/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |