MD SB849 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Raskin)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Raskin)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law that provide a separate jury proceeding to determine whether a person convicted of first degree murder is sentenced to imprisonment for life without the possibility of parole or imprisonment for life; establishing that a court may sentence a person convicted of first degree murder to imprisonment for life without the possibility of parole without the requirement of a separate jury sentencing procedure under specified circumstances; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Jury Sentencing Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Benson) {933128/1 Rejected (20-27) (Y: 20 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {653821/1 Rejected (21-26) (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {653821/1 Rejected (21-26) (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Raskin) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {413827/1 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {413827/1 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Benson) {933128/1 Rejected (20-27) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {653821/1 Rejected (21-26) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Court of Appeals
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Juries
Murder
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Juries
Murder
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences