MD SB845 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "eligible student" to include students enrolled directly in registered apprenticeship programs that partner with a public community college in the State to be eligible for Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships.
Title
Education – Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships – Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {644133/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB905 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |