MD SB844 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the provisions of law that establish the Newsprint Recycling Board; authorizing the Secretary of the Environment, rather than the Board, to exempt a publisher from certain recycled content requirements under certain circumstances; providing that the Secretary's failure to act on a certain application under certain circumstances, rather than the Board's failure to act, is an approval of the application; etc.
Title
Environment - Newsprint Recycling Board - Repeal and Transfer of Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Recycling
Reports
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Recycling
Reports