MD SB843 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for the sale of certain materials, equipment, and supplies to a certain licensed caterer if, under certain circumstances, the materials, equipment, and supplies will be used by the caterer to perform a catering contract that includes the provision of food and beverages; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Caterers - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {663724/5 (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Kagan) Rejected |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {663724/5 (Senator Peters) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters) Withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1023 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 11 | 236 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |