MD SB832 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a dispute resolution workgroup in the State Department of Education; providing for the membership of the workgroup; requiring the workgroup to make recommendations to the State Superintendent of Schools regarding rules and regulations establishing a specified dispute resolution process; etc.
Title
Child Care - Dispute Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {868072/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education, State Department of
Family Law
Mediation
Rules and Regulations
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education, State Department of
Family Law
Mediation
Rules and Regulations