MD SB829 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Special Secretary of the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in consultation with the Secretary of Transportation and the Attorney General, to establish guidelines for each unit to consider when determining the appropriate minority business enterprise participation percentage goal and outreach for an emergency procurement contract; requiring a unit's procurement officer to obtain a certain approval before making an emergency procurement; specifying when a unit is required to publish a certain notice; etc.
Title
State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-11) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-04-10 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {344338/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1091 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Examinations
Health
internet
meetings
Names
Notices
Procurement
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement
Time
Welfare
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Examinations
Health
internet
meetings
Names
Notices
Procurement
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement
Time
Welfare
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |