MD SB819 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to appoint the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services with the advice and consent of the Senate.
Title
Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services - Executive Director - Appointment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-37) |
2022-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
General Assembly
Governor
Public Officials
Public Safety
General Assembly
Governor
Public Officials
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 3501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |