MD SB81 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Baltimore Police Department to submit, beginning in fiscal year 2020 and in each subsequent fiscal year, a report on the expenditure of grants received from the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention for community policing efforts to the Baltimore City Delegation to the General Assembly; requiring the Department to submit a half-year report for fiscal year 2019 on the expenditure of grants received from the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 75
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-02-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {938477/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-15SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-10-09SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback