MD SB806 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing funding for, the award of, and the distribution of bonuses for child care providers and employees; and requiring, in fiscal year 2023, the Governor to include in the annual budget an appropriation of $16,000,000 to the State Department of Education to carry out the Act.
Title
Child Care Providers and Employees – Bonuses
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {233328/1 Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1100 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Subjects
Appropriations
Awards, Medals, and Prizes
Budgets
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Time
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Awards, Medals, and Prizes
Budgets
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Time
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment