MD SB801 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to develop the Maryland Teach It Forward Pilot Program that allows specified students at a specified public institution of higher education to enroll without paying tuition or fees and requires specified students to enter into a binding contract to make specified payments for up to 20 years after graduating; requiring the Commission to select one public institution of higher education to participate in a specified program; etc.
Title
Teach It Forward Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Contracts
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Teachers
Tuition
Contracts
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Teachers
Tuition