MD SB777 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB624
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Public Information Act Requests Made to Law Enforcement.
Title
Task Force to Study Public Information Act Requests Made to Law Enforcement - Establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 536 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-36) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-04-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {823628/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB777 (Carry Over) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 536
Subjects
Fees
Investigations and Inquiries
Police Conduct
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Investigations and Inquiries
Police Conduct
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 4 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |