MD SB766 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to establish an installment payment program for taxes in arrears on owner-occupied residential property; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to establish a program to divert owner-occupied residential property from the private tax lien sale process into an alternative program for the payment of taxes in arrears; authorizing the collector of taxes in Baltimore City to withhold any owner-occupied residential property from tax sale; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Collection of Unpaid Property Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {833721/1 Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB867 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Baltimore City
Circuit Courts
Debt Management
Fees
Foreclosure
Hearings
Judgments
Notices
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property - Local
Titles
Circuit Courts
Debt Management
Fees
Foreclosure
Hearings
Judgments
Notices
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property - Local
Titles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 10 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 894 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |