MD SB76 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a provider to post the provider's most recent disclosure statement on the provider's website; altering the number of times providers are required to hold a meeting open to all of the provider's subscribers each year; requiring an authorized officer of a provider to provide a summary of certain grievance information at certain meetings; requiring the Department of Aging to collect certain information about internal grievances; requiring a provider to submit certain reports to a subscriber under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-06 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2024-04-03 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {743021/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB68 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Assisted Living
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
complaints
Continuing Care
Contracts
Disclosure
Elderly
Elections
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
internet
meetings
Nursing Homes
Reports
Retirement
Termination of Services
Assisted Living
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
complaints
Continuing Care
Contracts
Disclosure
Elderly
Elections
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
internet
meetings
Nursing Homes
Reports
Retirement
Termination of Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 10 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 10 | 424 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 10 | 426 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 10 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 10 | 428 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 10 | 449 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |