MD SB753 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 469
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the City of Laurel to participate in the Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Laurel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 469
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-13HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-11SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB1413 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 468

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety14801(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14803(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback