MD SB750 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing an exception under certain circumstances for low speed electric vehicles to the vehicle registration requirement; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue a permit to a municipality that authorizes the municipality to operate on a highway up to four low speed electric vehicles; authorizing a municipality to apply for a permit; requiring a permit applicant to state certain information; establishing certain operating requirements for a municipal low speed electric vehicle; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low Speed Electric Vehicles - Use by Municipalities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2020-02-14SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation11130.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation13402(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation21104.5(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation24113.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback