MD SB75 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Favorable with Amendments Rejected (19-28)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from renewing the driver's license of an individual who is at least 85 years old without requiring the individual to complete the renewal transaction in person except under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Rejected (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Rejected (19-28)
2021-03-16SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {958171/1
2021-03-11SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2021-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {958171/1
2021-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-10-01SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB296 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation16115(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback