MD SB749 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the manner of election for certain members of the Charles County Board of Education by specifying that members be elected from certain county commissioner districts; providing for the ballot requirements for a certain election; requiring the State Board of Elections to declare the election of certain candidates; providing for the qualifications of the elected members of the county board; authorizing the student member of the county board to vote on all matters before the board, with certain exceptions; etc.
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-11) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {925162/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {834630/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1060 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 404
Subjects
Age
Ballots
Boundaries
Budgets
Census
Charles County
Collective Bargaining
County Administrators
County Commissioners
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Hearings
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Special Education
Students
Time
Voting
Weights and Measures
Ballots
Boundaries
Budgets
Census
Charles County
Collective Bargaining
County Administrators
County Commissioners
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Hearings
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Special Education
Students
Time
Voting
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |