MD HB1060 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the manner of election for certain members of the Charles County Board of Education by specifying that members be elected from certain county commissioner districts; providing for the ballot requirements for a certain election; requiring the State Board of Elections to declare the election of certain candidates; providing for the qualifications of the elected members of the county board; authorizing the student member of the county board to vote on all matters before the board, with the exception of certain matters; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (114-24)
2021-04-07HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {514034/1 (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee) Adopted
2021-04-01SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2021-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {514034/1
2021-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (121-12)
2021-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {605067/1 Adopted
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-02-09HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB749 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-05 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education3501(n/a)See Bill Text
Education3502(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback