MD SB743 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB96
Note: Carry Over of previous SB931
Note: Carry Over of previous SB931
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a certain evaluation regarding the impact of issuing an approval for certain environmental permits; requiring the Department to provide opportunities for certain communication with certain residents in a certain manner; and altering certain reporting requirements for certain State agencies.
Title
Climate, Labor, and Environmental Equity Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB743 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
SB931 (Carry Over) 2022-02-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
HB840 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-13 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
SB931 (Carry Over) 2022-02-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
HB840 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-13 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Air Pollution
Apprentices
Commerce and Business
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fees
Flood Control
Health
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Minorities
Notices
Pollution
Public Information
Reports
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
studies
Time
Veterans
Weather
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Apprentices
Commerce and Business
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fees
Flood Control
Health
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Minorities
Notices
Pollution
Public Information
Reports
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
studies
Time
Veterans
Weather
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1-7A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1-7A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1-7A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1-7A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1-7A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1-7A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0743?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0743f.pdf |