MD SB737 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Sustainable Maryland Program Fund to expand and enhance Sustainable Maryland's promotion and support of communities in the State in the effort to realize environmental, economic, and social sustainability; specifying that the Fund may be used for educating communities in the development of strategies to achieve green community certification; requiring, beginning with fiscal year 2022, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $225,000 to the Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {984533/1 Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB1520 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education13105(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback