MD SB728 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, before October 1, 2016, a licensed firearm dealer to conditionally sell, rent, or transfer a firearm to a firearm applicant under specified circumstances; prohibiting the licensee from selling, renting, or transferring the firearm under specified circumstances; requiring the licensee to make specified notifications under specified circumstances; authorizing a law enforcement agency to confiscate a specified firearm under specified circumstances; and terminating the Act at the end of September 30, 2016.
Title
Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers - Background Checks
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. David Brinkley [R] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Joseph Getty [R] |
Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Allan Kittleman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Guns
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Notices
Public Safety
Search and Seizure
Sunset
Weapons
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Guns
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Notices
Public Safety
Search and Seizure
Sunset
Weapons