MD SB728 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of members of the State Board for Professional Engineers; requiring one of the engineer members of the Board to be appointed, without regard to specific professional practice, from a list submitted by the Maryland Society of Professional Engineers; etc.
Title
State Board for Professional Engineers - Increase in Membership and Practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-04-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-17 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |