MD SB717 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the type of access and the circumstances under which certain access to new employees by exclusive representatives is required to be permitted by the State, a system institution, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, and Baltimore City Community College; altering, from 20 minutes to 30 minutes, the period of time for which an exclusive representative is required to be permitted to address certain new employees under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-41) |
2021-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {137172/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB904 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Collective Bargaining
Communications
Community Colleges
Contractors
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Identification
meetings
Notices
Privacy
Records
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Video
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Communications
Community Colleges
Contractors
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Identification
meetings
Notices
Privacy
Records
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Video
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |