MD SB701 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county to borrow money and incur indebtedness through the issuance and sale of notes in anticipation of the receipt of the county's allocation of funds from a certain separate account of the Bay Restoration Fund; authorizing a county to expend the net proceeds of the sale of a certain issue of notes only to make certain grants and loans or to refund one or more issues of notes; authorizing the principal of certain notes and the interest on certain notes to be paid from certain sources; etc.
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-20) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {344431/1 Adopted |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB878 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Counties
Environment
Grants
Industry and Technology
Interest
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Counties
Environment
Grants
Industry and Technology
Interest
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 19 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 19 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 19 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 19 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |