MD SB692 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the purchase of certain zero-emission and hybrid mobile machinery during taxable years 2024 through 2027 by certain eligible taxpayers for use in the taxpayers' businesses or for rental or lease to the general public; and requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2027, on the utilization of the tax credit.
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Purchase of Zero-Emission and Hybrid Mobile Machinery
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Katie Hester [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {703822/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1181 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-10 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 757 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |