MD SB687 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to report to the General Assembly and the Governor by December 1, 2023, and every 5 years thereafter, on the efforts by the State, political subdivisions, and housing authorities to promote fair housing choice and racial and economic housing integration; requiring the Department of Planning, in consultation with the Department of Housing and Community Development, on request of a local jurisdiction, to provide certain technical assistance; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and Local Housing Programs - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-09SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (106-31)
2021-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {940719/1 Adopted
2021-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-03-20HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {274534/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-03SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB90 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Housing and Community Development2302(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development2401(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development2402(n/a)See Bill Text
Land Use3114(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback