MD HB90 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to report to the General Assembly and the Governor by December 1 each year on the total of households receiving certain financial assistance disaggregated by race, disability status, and income; requiring the Department to administer its programs related to housing and community development to affirmatively further fair housing and prohibiting the Department from taking any action that is materially inconsistent with the duty to affirmatively further fair housing; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and Local Housing Programs – Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-10-21HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB687 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-03 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Housing and Community Development2302(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development2401(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development2402(n/a)See Bill Text
Land Use3114(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback