MD SB683 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB333

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a local board of elections to designate the locations of ballot drop boxes in accordance with certain factors; requiring each local board to submit proposed ballot drop box locations to the State Administrator of Elections; requiring a local board to ensure the security of ballot drop boxes; requiring that certain guidelines for absentee voting established by the State Board provide for a permanent absentee ballot list; prohibiting canvassing, electioneering, or posting campaign material on a ballot drop box; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Voting - Permanent Absentee Ballot List, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Floor Amendment 253726/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment 803728/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment 963725/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment 873029/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 56
2021-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (32-15)
2021-04-02SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (95-40)
2021-04-01HouseFloor Amendment {253726/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (41-94)
2021-04-01HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
2021-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {515369/1 Adopted
2021-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-03-20HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-20HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (31-14)
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {803728/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
2021-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {803626/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn
2021-03-18SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {803626/1 (Senator Ready)
2021-03-18SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {803626/1 (Senator Ready)
2021-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {963725/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-32)
2021-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {873029/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-32)
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {374235/1 Adopted
2021-03-17SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
2021-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {374235/1
2021-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-03SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-03SenateHearing canceled
2021-02-12SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

SB333 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law2304(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law9303(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law9310(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law9311.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0683?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0683f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0683t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0683e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_56_sb0683e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0683_37423501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0683_87302901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0683_96372501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0683_80362601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0683_80372801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0683_51536901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0683_25372601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0683_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0498.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0499.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0502.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0599.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0974.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0975.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0856.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback