MD SB679 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Allegany County, for the 2020-2021 licensing period, to reimburse holders of certain alcoholic beverages licenses the entire amount of the annual license fee and to reimburse holders of certain other alcoholic beverages licenses a certain amount of the annual license fee for the 2021-2022 licensing period; etc.
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB880 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Emergency Bills
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Emergency Bills
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset
Time