MD SB669 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB550
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 809
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 809
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount in controversy in civil proceedings in which the right to a jury trial may be limited by legislation from more than $15,000 to more than $25,000; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 809 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-35) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {672915/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-4) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB902 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Referred Rules
SB550 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
SB550 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Declaration of Rights | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Declaration of Rights | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |