MD SB66 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health to publish an annual report on the suicides of veterans and members currently serving in the armed services of the United States; limiting the information in the report to the age, sex, race or ethnicity, nature of service if known, and method of suicide of the veteran or armed services member; requiring the report to include aggregate information for the lesser of the previous 5 years or the total number of years for which information is available; etc.
Title
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] |
Sen. Justin Ready [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {917570/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-09-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Death
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Veterans
Vital Records
Death
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Veterans
Vital Records