MD SB658 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Granting collective bargaining rights to graduate students within the University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateHearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-04SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB214 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions3101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3102(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3403(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback