MD SB651 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain provisions governing signage at retail service stations supersede inconsistent local law; altering a signage requirement for retail service stations relating to the price of regular gasoline so that the signage prominently displays clearly and visibly the credit and debit price, if higher than the cash price, or the credit and debit price and the cash price; repealing an exemption from a certain signage requirement for retail service station dealers with not more than 3 dispensing units; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Sale of Motor Fuel - Pricing Signage (Gas Price Clarity Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-8) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {223625/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {223625/1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB882 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Subjects
Business Regulation
Commerce and Business
Fuel
Laws and Ordinances
Prices
Service Stations
Signs and Billboards
Commerce and Business
Fuel
Laws and Ordinances
Prices
Service Stations
Signs and Billboards
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 10 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |