MD SB651 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a Baltimore County correctional officer and a Baltimore County detention officer for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than 75 weeks; and providing that the Act applies only prospectively.
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB85 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Subjects
Airports
Allegany County
Ambulances
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Correctional Officers
Counties
Disabilities
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Harford County
Howard County
Injury
Law Enforcement
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Rescue Squads
Safety
Sheriffs
State Employees
Time
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Allegany County
Ambulances
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Correctional Officers
Counties
Disabilities
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Harford County
Howard County
Injury
Law Enforcement
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Rescue Squads
Safety
Sheriffs
State Employees
Time
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 9 | 628 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 629 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |