MD SB651 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling in the State a certain expanded polystyrene food service product on or after January 1, 2019; prohibiting certain food service businesses and certain schools from selling or providing food in certain expanded polystyrene food service products on or after January 1, 2019; requiring a county health department to impose certain penalties for violations of the Act; requiring a county health department to notify the Department of the Environment of certain violations; etc.
Title
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of
Health
Higher Education
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of
Health
Higher Education
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations