MD SB651 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to conduct a survey of the county boards of education to make a specified determination about the use of virtual learning opportunities for students across the State; and requiring the Department to develop and adopt specified guidelines and policies regarding the utilization of virtual learning opportunities for all students in the State.
Title
State Department of Education - Virtual Learning Opportunities - Survey and Report
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Bates [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology