MD SB651 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of green business incentive zones in the State; establishing eligibility criteria and factors to be considered by the Secretary of Business and Economic Development in approving the zones; establishing procedures for applying for establishment of the zones and the benefits available in the zones; establishing a State income tax credit and real property tax credit available to specified businesses located in a green business incentive zone; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn | |
2012-03-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Budget and Taxation & Finance |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Apprentices
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Comptroller
Counties
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Income Tax
Job Training
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Apprentices
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Comptroller
Counties
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Income Tax
Job Training
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0651.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0651f.pdf |