MD SB649 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sample-Hughes, Rosenberg and Belcastro)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sample-Hughes, Rosenberg and Belcastro)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring regulations of a primary procurement unit to require the unit to make a good faith effort to solicit at least one bid from a certified minority business enterprise for a small procurement in Category II and Category III of the State Procurement Regulations; requiring a certain report to the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to state the total number and value of contracts entered into by the unit for which no minority business enterprise participation goals were established; etc.
Title
Procurement - MBE Program Compliance Review and Oversight
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sample-Hughes, Rosenberg and Belcastro) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2021-04-12 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sample-Hughes, Rosenberg and Belcastro) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2021-04-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Simonaire and Lam) |
2021-04-12 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-04-12 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Simonaire and Lam) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2021-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {206681/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-29 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {904139/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1348 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Contractors
Disclosure
Ethics
Examinations
General Services, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
meetings
Minorities
Notices
Procurement
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Time
Transportation, Department of
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Contractors
Disclosure
Ethics
Examinations
General Services, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
meetings
Minorities
Notices
Procurement
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Time
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |