MD SB636 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the period of time for which certain employees of the Office of the Sheriff of Cecil County are required to serve a probationary period; altering which deputy sheriffs in the Office have the right to organize and collectively bargain with the Sheriff and the Cecil County Executive with regard to certain wages, benefits, and working conditions; correcting certain references to the government of Cecil County and to a certain position in the Office; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-8) (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-8) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Cecil County
Collective Bargaining
Correctional Institutions
County Executives
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Correctional Institutions
County Executives
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment