MD SB635 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the term of the members of the Kent County Board of Education; requiring the County Commissioners of Kent County to appoint a qualified individual to fill any vacancy on the Board; repealing provisions providing for the election of a specified candidate to fill a vacancy; requiring specified members of the Board to be elected in a specified general election; providing for the termination of the terms of elected members; etc.
Title
Kent County Board of Education - Members - Terms and Vacancies
Sponsors
Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-4) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Special Order later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |