MD SB634 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an electric cooperative to construct, maintain, or operate or allow others to construct, maintain, or operate conducting or communications facilities for telecommunications and broadband Internet services along, on, under, or across various types of property; requiring an electric cooperative to give certain notice to certain property owners at least 60 days before constructing certain facilities in a certain electric easement or making capacity available for certain services in the electric easement; etc.
Title
Electric Cooperatives - Powers - Conducting or Communications Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {433892/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {167677/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {167677/1 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Easements
Equipment
Federal Government
Grants
Hearings
Industry and Technology
internet
Notices
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Equipment
Federal Government
Grants
Hearings
Industry and Technology
internet
Notices
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities
Utility Regulation