MD SB631 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization to use the most recent treatment criteria developed by the American Society of Addiction Medicine for addictive, substance-related, and co-occurring conditions for all medical necessity and utilization management determinations for substance use disorder benefits; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {737971/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Claims
Disclosure
Drugs
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Opioids
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Disclosure
Drugs
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Opioids
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse