MD SB630 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the creation of a lien on owner-occupied residential property by contract or as a result of a breach of contract for the payment of medical debt.
Title
Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB673 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-08 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 14 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 7 | 105.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0630?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0630f.pdf |