MD HB673 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-08 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-08 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the creation of a lien on owner-occupied residential property by contract or as a result of a breach of contract for the payment of medical debt.
Title
Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2024-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {223025/1 Adopted |
2024-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB630 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 14 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 7 | 105.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |