MD SB63 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a manufacturer of an investigational drug, biological product, or device to make available the investigational drug, biological product, or device to eligible patients; specifying the manner in which a specified drug, product, or device may be provided to eligible patients; prohibiting a health occupations board from taking specified action against a health care provider's license on a specified basis; establishing that the Act does not create a specified cause of action; etc.
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Death
Death Penalty
Disclosure
Diseases
Drugs
Equipment
Estates and Trusts
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospices
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Health
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Patients
Physicians
Public Employees
Public Health
Public Officials
Death
Death Penalty
Disclosure
Diseases
Drugs
Equipment
Estates and Trusts
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospices
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Health
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Patients
Physicians
Public Employees
Public Health
Public Officials