MD SB625 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to sell at tax sale a residential property to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service if the property is not owner-occupied.
Title
Baltimore City – Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges – Tax Sales of Non–Owner–Occupied Residential Property
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB777 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-19 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 849.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0625?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0625f.pdf |