MD SB624 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Task Force to Study the Expansion of Career and Technical Education in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations concerning career and technical education; requiring the Task Force to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2016; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Expansion of Career and Technical Education in Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714639/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Education
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Education
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment