MD SB605 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring new and replacement window coverings to be cordless in foster homes, family day care homes, and child care centers; requiring existing window coverings to meet specified minimum standards in foster homes, family day care homes, and child care centers; authorizing the appropriate agency to require the replacement of specified window coverings under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Angel's Law - Foster Care and Child Care - Window Coverings
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. David Harrington [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Rona Kramer [D] | Sen. Michael Lenett [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (139-1) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-20 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Child Care
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
Human Resources, Department of
Minors
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services
Child Care
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
Human Resources, Department of
Minors
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services